Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Licensed Activities | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |