Senate | 02/21/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |