Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-001-000 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Reported Back To Judiciary; 003-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | To Subcommittee on Property | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |