Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Re-assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |