Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0468
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2023
|
Effective Date August 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-038-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 050-005-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 010-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|