Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |