House | 04/28/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Assigned to Gaming Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lance Yednock | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Arrived in House | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass Agriculture; 012-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Agriculture | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Faraci |