Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0558
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|