Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0397
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 16, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-013-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|