Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Postponed - Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|