Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Postponed - Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|