Senate | 03/05/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |