Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0400
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Local Government; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|