Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0256
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date June 30, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Faraci
|
|
|