Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Labor; 011-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|