Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0900
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported Back To Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 003-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|