Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|