Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0510
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-019-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 034-018-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 008-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 011-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|