Senate | 04/26/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |