Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|