Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0586
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Effective Date May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 035-003-018
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 035-003-018
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-004-040
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Racial Impact Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-003
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Racial Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 075-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|