House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 075-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 038-017-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Do Pass Insurance; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Postponed - Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|