Senate | 04/18/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | To Subcommittee on Firearms | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |