Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|