Senate | 03/31/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to State Government | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |