Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Firearms
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
To Subcommittee on Firearms
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|