Senate | 04/10/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Postponed - Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |