House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 068-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|