Senate | 05/14/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |