Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|