Senate | 04/12/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-002 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |