Senate | 04/19/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2024 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |