Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Revenue | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura |