Senate | 11/20/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |