Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0626
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 050-009-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|