Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|