Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|