Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Postponed - Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Assigned to Insurance | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |