Senate | 06/26/2024 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/25/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 | ||
Senate | 05/24/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | To Subcommittee on Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/19/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |