Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Postponed - State Government | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Assigned to State Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Directed to Multiple Committees State Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |