Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0929
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 012-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 016-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Do Pass Labor; 015-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Assigned to Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|