Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0767
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Postponed - Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|