Senate | 03/20/2024 | Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Do Pass Executive | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |