Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0936
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Postponed - Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|