Senate | 04/19/2024 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |