Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0778
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date August 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|