LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Illinois IL
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB3146
Action History
IL
Illinois Senate Bill SB3146
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Illinois 2023-2024 Regular Session
Illinois Senate Bill SB3146
Action History
Senate
04/12/2024
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Senate
04/05/2024
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
Senate
03/15/2024
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
Senate
02/06/2024
Referred to Assignments
Senate
02/06/2024
First Reading
Senate
02/06/2024
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler