House
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 10, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Re-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|