Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0637
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading **
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|