Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0948
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date July 1, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Postponed - Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with Secretary by Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|